+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Removed from Consent Calendar
- Returned to Committee of Origin
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE LOUNGE-MONDAY, APRIL 10, 2006-7:00PM
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 6
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Pursuant to Rule 44 - HBs for Perfection Consent - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor