+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 97 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 1
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on General Laws
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
4359H02.01H
Distributed
4359H01.03H
Distributed