+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 9, 2008, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Retirement
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor