+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Committee of Origin - Education
- Removed from Consent Calendar
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass Consent
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 8:30am, Bingham Conference Room
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 10, 2018, 1:00pm, SCR 1
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Education
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Consent and House Procedure
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 19, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor