+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 7, 2010, 12:00P.M.,SENATE LOUNGE
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 134 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 2
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 143 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 3
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: International Trade and Immigration
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor