+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Small Business
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time