+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- House Message
On May 13, 2022 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 106 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts - SS AYES: 107 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Reported to the House with... - SS
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 30 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- SS Adopted
- SS Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, March 8, 2022, SCR 1, 10:30 a.m. or upon recess, whichever is later.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: General Laws
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 137 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 5
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor