+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (52)
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Message
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 144 NOES: 1
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145
- House Message
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 28
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29
- Senate Message
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 29
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- SS Adopted
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
- House Message
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Message
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES JONES, ELMER, WEBBER
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS DIXON, SCHAEFER, LAGER, JUSTUS, KEAVENY
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, May 6, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - ha 1 adopted
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor