+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 27, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 3, 8:00AM, SCR 1
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 128 NOES: 19
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Small Business
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (56)
Type:
Primary Sponsor