+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, April 28, 2016, 9:00am, Senate Lounge
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Defeated - AYES: 65 NOES: 74 PRESENT: 0
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Insurance
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Health Insurance
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 7, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled