+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 9, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
- House Concurs - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 132 NOES: 15
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 131 NOES: 15
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 02
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 19, 8:30AM, SCR 1
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 10
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: International Trade and Job Creation
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor