+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, May 7, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 93 NOES: 56
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - ha 1 adopted
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (11)
5478H02.13H
Adopted
5478H02.04L
Distributed
5478H02.07H
Distributed
5478H02.05H
Distributed
5478H02.06H
Distributed
5478H02.04H
Distributed
5478H02.03H
Distributed
5478H02.02L
Distributed
5478H02.02H
Distributed
5478H02.01L
Distributed
5478H02.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor