+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 10, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- House Concurs - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 133 NOES: 017
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 128 NOES: 019
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 125 NOES: 021
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading - SA 1, SA 2, SA 1 TO SA 3, SA 3AA, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9 ADOPTED YEAS: 30 NAYS: 03
- SS Adopted - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 03
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2, SA 1 TO SA 3, SA 3AA, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9 ADOPTED YEAS: 30 NAYS: 03
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 03
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 ADOPTED/SS, SA 1/SA 1 TO SA 2 PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 16, 8:30AM, SCR 2
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 000
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - not Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - not Consent
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor