+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor