+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 15, 2:00PM, SCR 2
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 3, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 97 NOES: 46
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 129 NOES: 14
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: International Trade and Job Creation
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor