+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE LOUNGE-TUESDAY, APRIL 25, 2006-8:30AM
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Commerce, Energy, and the Environment
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 155 NOES: 0
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor