+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 7, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 0
- HCS Adopted
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
- Read Second Time
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor