+ − Actions (24)
On July 10, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 14, 2001 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 28 NAYS: 00
On May 11, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 000
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Perfected
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Public Safety, Law Enforcement,Veteran Affairs
On January 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 15, 2000 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor