+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor