+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SS AND SA 1 PENDING
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE LOUNGE-TUESDAY, APRIL 11, 2006-12:00PM
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On April 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 0
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Pursuant to Rule 44 - HBs for Perfection Consent - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor