+ − Actions (18)
On June 19, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On April 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 0
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation and Motor Vehicles
On January 14, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2003 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor