+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 102 NOES: 55
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Workforce Development and Workplace Safety
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor