+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- House Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 132 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts - SS#3 AYES: 128 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up
- SS Withdrawn
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS#3
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS pending
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Withdrawn
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, March 7, 2018, 12:00pm, SCR 1
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled