+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 25, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 2
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 158 NOES: 0
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES BARTLE, YECKEL, SCOTT, CASKEY AND KENNEDY
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES HANAWAY, LIPKE, RUESTMAN, BURNETT AND CARNAHAN
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - AS AMENDED
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SSA 1 FOR SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 2
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 13, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
- Read Second Time
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor