+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 9, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE LOUNGE-MONDAY, APRIL 10, 2006-7:00PM
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 0
On April 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Pursuant to Rule 44 - HBs for Perfection Consent - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor