+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 2, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the House:
- Second Rd/Refer: Fin & Govt Org, Vet Affairs & Elections
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 3
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
- Read Second Time
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor