+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 5
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time