+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, noon or upon noon recess, Senate Lounge
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 5
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor