+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 8, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143
- House Adopts - SCS AYES: 140
- Taken Up
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 30
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Education
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - ha 1 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
4603L02.01H
Defeated
4603L02.02H
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor