+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, March 7, 2018, 8:00am, SCR 1
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Government Reform
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Government Efficiency
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
4077H02.01H
Distributed