+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - HCA 2 AYES: 115 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 2
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 2 AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Bill Not Heard
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, and HA 4 adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (9)
4958H02.09H
Committee
4958H02.04H
Adopted
4958H02.05H
Distributed
4958H02.06H
Adopted
4958H02.07H
Adopted
4958H02.01H
Adopted
4958H02.02H
Distributed
4958H02.03H
Defeated
4958H01.06H
Committee
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: HB 1605
April 19, 2016: HB 1605 (*HA 5)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor