+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Rule 47
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (6)
4145H02.09H
Distributed
4145H02.01H
Distributed
4145H02.02H
Distributed
4145H02.03H
Distributed
4145H02.07H
Distributed
4145H01.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor