+ − Actions (30)
On July 11, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 17, 2002 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SS#2 AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 140 NOES: 2
- Reported to the House with... - SS#2 AS AMENDED
On May 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 29 NAYS: 3
- SS Adopted
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Withdrawn
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 ADOPTED/SS AND SA 3 PENDING
On April 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Second Rd/Refer: Fin & Govt Org, Vet Affairs & Elections
On April 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 128 NOES: 11
On March 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 20, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor