+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor