+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 2, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 134 NOES: 24 PRESENT: 1
- House Concurs - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 136 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 1
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 2, SA 3 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS AND SA 1 PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Pensions and General Laws
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 131 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 2
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HSA 1 FOR HA 1 ADOPTED
- HS Adopted in House
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Laid Over - HSA 1 FOR HA 1, HA 1 AND HS PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar - HA 1 AND HS PENDING
- House Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor