+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY. APRIL 25. NOON, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor