+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCA 1
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SCA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 26
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - SCA 1
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass with sca 1
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 29, 2014, 1:30pom, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 112 NOES: 31
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected with Amendments - ha 1 adopted AYES: 115 NOES: 30
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (12)
5409H01.02F
Distributed
5409H01.01F
Distributed
5409H01.15H
Distributed
5409H01.14H
Distributed
5409H01.07H
Distributed
5409H01.04H
Distributed
5409H01.06H
Distributed
5409H01.02L
Distributed
5409H01.03H
Distributed
5409H01.01L
Distributed
5409H01.01H
Adopted
5409H01.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor