+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 7, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation and Motor Vehicles
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor