+ − Actions (24)
On July 3, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 2, 2002 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 146 NOES: 0
On May 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SA 1
On May 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 29 NAYS: 1
On April 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Local Government & Economic Development
On April 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 0
On March 21, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On March 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government and Related Matters
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor