+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 25, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NAYS: 00
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor