+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 25, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- House Concurs - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 144 NOES: 000
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 000
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 00
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 12:00PM, SCR 1
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 10, 12:00PM, SCR 1
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 0
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Vote to Reconsider
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time