+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:15pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 1
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
5524H01.01H
Withdrawn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor