+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Small Business, Insurance & Indust Rel
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 155 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Small Business
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor