+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - No Action Taken
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor