+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor