+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor