+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (83)
On June 24, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 14, 2010 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 145 NOES: 7
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 8
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 140 NOES: 8
On May 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On May 13, 2010 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES WALLACE, SCHAD, STREAM, LAMPE, BRINGER
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On May 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS PEARCE, SHIELDS, RUPP, DAYS AND WILSON
On May 13, 2010 in the House:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 12, 2010, UPON EVENING RECESS, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 4, SA 5 ADOPTED YEAS: 24 NAYS: 7
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 26 NAYS: 6
On May 12, 2010 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS#2 AS AMENDED
On May 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
- SS Adopted - SA 1, SA 4, SA 5 ADOPTED
- Senate Substitute Offered - SS#2
- SS Withdrawn
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 5, SA 6, SA 1 TO SA 7, SA 2 TO SA 7, SA 7 AS AMENDED ADOPTED/SCS, SS/SCS PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED/SCS, SS/SCS, SA 4 PENDING
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On May 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 6, 2010, 8:00A.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On May 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On May 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 21, 2010, 1:30P.M.,SENATE LOUNGE
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 139 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 129 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 0
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HA 2 TO HA 7 ADOPTED/HA 7/HCS#2 AS AMENDED PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Laid Over - HA 5 ADOPTED/HA 7/HCS#2 AS AMENDED PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 ADOPTED/HCS#2 AS AMENDED PENDING
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass - HCS #2 VOTED DO PASS
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin
- Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 11, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor