+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 11, UPON EVENING ADJOURNMENT, SCR 1
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 097 NOES: 041
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor