+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Corrections
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time