+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 TO SS FOR SCS PENDING
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED, NOTE ROOM CHANGE, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 5, 2014, upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled
- Public Hearing Held
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 110 NOES: 39
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 110 NOES: 37
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected with Amendments - ha 1, ha 2, ha 3, ha 1 to ha 4, ha 4 as amended adopted
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (9)
5330H01.09H
Adopted
5330H01.10H
Adopted
5330H01.04L
Distributed
5330H01.06H
Adopted
5330H01.08H
Adopted
5330H01.02L
Distributed
5330H01.01H
Adopted
5330H01.03L
Distributed
Amendment 9
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor